NY S03543 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of over the counter contraceptive products and voluntary sterilization procedures.
Title
Relates to the definition of over the counter contraceptive products and voluntary sterilization procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.245 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |