NY S03546 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "food retail establishment subsidization for healthy communities act" (FRESH Communities); provides loans, loan guarantees, interest subsidies and grants to businesses, municipalities, not-for-profit corporations or local development corporations for the purpose of attracting, maintaining or permitting the expansion of food retail establishments in underserved areas.
Title
Enacts the "food retail establishment subsidization for healthy communities act" (FRESH Communities); provides loans, loan guarantees, interest subsidies and grants to businesses, municipalities, not-for-profit corporations or local development corporations for the purpose of attracting, maintaining or permitting the expansion of food retail establishments in underserved areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2024-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.284 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.299 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09069 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means