NY S03564 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4810A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4810A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to labor performed under certain public work contracts; defines "job order contract" as certain competitive bid, indefinite quantity, fixed price, multi-task contracts; provides that such contracts shall have a defined scope of work and detailed description of such work; provides that such information shall be filed with the fiscal officer before soliciting for bids; provides that the cost of a job order contract may not exceed $500,000.
Title
Relates to labor performed under certain public work contracts; defines "job order contract" as certain competitive bid, indefinite quantity, fixed price, multi-task contracts; provides that such contracts shall have a defined scope of work and detailed description of such work; provides that such information shall be filed with the fiscal officer before soliciting for bids; provides that the cost of a job order contract may not exceed $500,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4810A |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1637 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3564A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A04810 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - tabled