NY S03613 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7038
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7038
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to catastrophic or reinsurance coverage issued to certain small groups.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to catastrophic or reinsurance coverage issued to certain small groups.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7038 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1185 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07038 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - signed chap.576