NY S03652 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates lay individuals as one-day marriage officiants in order to solemnize marriages.
Title
Designates lay individuals as one-day marriage officiants in order to solemnize marriages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.467 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.857 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04895 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means