NY S03847 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the inability to pay child support an affirmative defense to non-support of child offenses, rather than an element of such offenses.
Title
Makes the inability to pay child support an affirmative defense to non-support of child offenses, rather than an element of such offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.756 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1155 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07968 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to codes