NY S03851 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the inclusion of a confession of judgment in a contract or agreement for a financial product or service.
Title
Prohibits the inclusion of a confession of judgment in a contract or agreement for a financial product or service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.578 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 3851 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3851A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1684 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03636 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes