NY S03877 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the governance of food labels or the portion of food produced, processed, transported, stored, marketed, distributed, sold or offered for sale by the state; vests jurisdiction in all matters pertaining to such exclusively in the state; preempts any local rule or ordinance on such subject.
Title
Relates to the governance of food labels or the portion of food produced, processed, transported, stored, marketed, distributed, sold or offered for sale by the state; vests jurisdiction in all matters pertaining to such exclusively in the state; preempts any local rule or ordinance on such subject.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | AMENDED 3877A |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.493 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.325 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |