NY S03944 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing a heart disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing a heart disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-05-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3944A
2019-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.230
2019-02-21SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06237 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - print number 6237a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback