NY S04001 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to minimum wage rates for covered airport workers; provides no such worker shall be compensated at a rate lower then the applicable standard rate.
Title
Relates to minimum wage rates for covered airport workers; provides no such worker shall be compensated at a rate lower then the applicable standard rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.88 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.142 |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | substituted for a3020a |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.236 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03020 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - substituted by s4001