NY S04104 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to solicitation of donations on state highways.
Title
Relates to solicitation of donations on state highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.567 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4104A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03400 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION