NY S04114 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to electronic permit applications and electronic recordkeeping.
Title
Relates to electronic permit applications and electronic recordkeeping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.262 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.321 |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4114 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-02-28 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.62 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-24 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2640 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.321 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A02640 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.262