NY S04172 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that payments in lieu of taxes subject to the two percent limit shall be calculated based upon the real property acquired by the authority in the aggregate in each municipality or school district and not on parcel by parcel basis.
Title
Provides that payments in lieu of taxes subject to the two percent limit shall be calculated based upon the real property acquired by the authority in the aggregate in each municipality or school district and not on parcel by parcel basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1007 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06457 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions