NY S04203 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to orders committing guardianship and custody of a child; enacts provisions relating to post-termination visitation or contact.
Title
Relates to orders committing guardianship and custody of a child; enacts provisions relating to post-termination visitation or contact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.268 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.244 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a2199a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4203A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.764 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02199 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.268