NY S04222 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensing board in the county of Westchester and requirements in a cause of action.
Title
Relates to the licensing board in the county of Westchester and requirements in a cause of action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.693 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.434 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4222 |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-27 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.154 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3486 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.434 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03486 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.693