NY S04223 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Westchester to establish by local law an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for all code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Title
Authorizes the county of Westchester to establish by local law an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for all code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1500 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04073 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments