NY S04246 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to provide a single line upon which to enter all contributions to certain funds on personal income tax forms as authorized pursuant to part II of article 22 of the tax law.
Title
Directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to provide a single line upon which to enter all contributions to certain funds on personal income tax forms as authorized pursuant to part II of article 22 of the tax law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.670 |
2012-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |