NY S04294 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to communication service surcharges applied to Onondaga county; extends provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to communication service surcharges applied to Onondaga county; extends provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.124 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.411 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a4763 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1138 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04763 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.124