NY S04370 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6567
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6567
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the electronic service of orders of the public service commission.
Title
Provides for the electronic service of orders of the public service commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6567 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.70 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06567 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - signed chap.95