NY S04397 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to require and provide at least three hours of annual training regarding bail, recognizance, and commitment procedures and standards for all judges exercising preliminary jurisdiction over any offense.
Title
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to require and provide at least three hours of annual training regarding bail, recognizance, and commitment procedures and standards for all judges exercising preliminary jurisdiction over any offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4899 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.791 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | REFERENCE CHANGED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04899 (Same As) 2023-12-22 - tabled