NY S04441 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - PRINT NUMBER 4441B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - PRINT NUMBER 4441B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires child protective services to document home visits as part of a treatment plan, supervision and monitoring, pursuant to a court order, or on an emergency basis with photographs.
Title
Requires child protective services to document home visits as part of a treatment plan, supervision and monitoring, pursuant to a court order, or on an emergency basis with photographs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4441B |
2014-03-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2013-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4441A |
2013-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |