NY S04464 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the issuance of special number and distinctive license plates for military service members and members of veterans organizations without payment of service charges or renewal fees.
Title
Directs the issuance of special number and distinctive license plates for military service members and members of veterans organizations without payment of service charges or renewal fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.541 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06467 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation