NY S04588 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system as "NYPD Det. TSgt. Joseph G. Lemm Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system as "NYPD Det. TSgt. Joseph G. Lemm Memorial Bridge".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.364
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a6332a
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4588A
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.409
2019-03-15SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06332 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4588a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback