NY S04639 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a program for adults over fifty who are under community supervision or who will be released from a state correctional facility.
Title
Establishes a program for adults over fifty who are under community supervision or who will be released from a state correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4639A |
2020-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A11010 (Same As) 2020-09-09 - referred to correction