NY S04657 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.263
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.263
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the right of tenants to call police or emergency assistance without fear of losing their housing as the result of landlord actions or local nuisance laws.
Title
Establishes the right of tenants to call police or emergency assistance without fear of losing their housing as the result of landlord actions or local nuisance laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.263 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.587 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4657A |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-04-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ruling of chair on point of order |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ruling of chair on point of order |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.57 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | rules report cal.57 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-05 | Senate | print number 2665a |
2019-04-05 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-03-19 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-24 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2665A |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.587 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4657A |
2019-04-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02665 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.263