NY S04679 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the current real property tax exemption for persons over 65 may also be extended to those persons who are totally and permanently disabled; provides that municipalities shall provide by local law that such shall be granted to either those 65 years of age or older or to those who are totally and permanently disabled, or to both categories of persons.
Title
Provides that the current real property tax exemption for persons over 65 may also be extended to those persons who are totally and permanently disabled; provides that municipalities shall provide by local law that such shall be granted to either those 65 years of age or older or to those who are totally and permanently disabled, or to both categories of persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.793 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A02514 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - held for consideration in real property taxation