NY S04679 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portions of the state highway system as the "Rochester Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates portions of the state highway system as the "Rochester Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4679A |
2015-06-08 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.529 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07347 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation