NY S04725 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7865
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7865
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the pre-audit of expenditures from the state insurance fund by the state comptroller.
Title
Relates to the pre-audit of expenditures from the state insurance fund by the state comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7865 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2159 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07865 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - tabled