NY S04733 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Bryan Johnson's law"; includes prior convictions of operation of a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs as prior convictions of driving while intoxicated.
Title
Enacts "Bryan Johnson's law"; includes prior convictions of operation of a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs as prior convictions of driving while intoxicated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.631 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4733A |
2022-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06101 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in transportation