NY A06101 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Bryan Johnson's law"; includes prior convictions of operation of a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs as prior convictions of driving while intoxicated.
Title
Enacts "Bryan Johnson's law"; includes prior convictions of operation of a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs as prior convictions of driving while intoxicated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | print number 6101a |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04733 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - referred to transportation