NY S04736 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes healthcare facilities and professionals to pay for the fair market value of practice management, billing or health information technology services.
Title
Authorizes healthcare facilities and professionals to pay for the fair market value of practice management, billing or health information technology services.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1139 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10385 (Same As) 2016-05-25 - referred to health