NY S04763 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the Sacandaga river within the definition of inland waterways for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Includes the Sacandaga river within the definition of inland waterways for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7241 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1193 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07241 (Same As) 2011-07-20 - signed chap.166