NY S04776 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificates to a charitable bail organization to deposit money as bail under certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to certificates to a charitable bail organization to deposit money as bail under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4776A |
2018-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04880 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE