NY S04810 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the MTA's exemption from environmental quality review standards established by article 8 of the environmental conservation law.
Title
Eliminates the MTA's exemption from environmental quality review standards established by article 8 of the environmental conservation law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-05-19 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A3379 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means