NY S04831 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount of tax charged for the sale or transfer of adult-use cannabis products to a retail customer; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to the amount of tax charged for the sale or transfer of adult-use cannabis products to a retail customer; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4831B |
2024-02-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2024-02-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4831A |
2024-02-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2023-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A04619 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means