NY S04842 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including certain reserve veterans for purposes of the veteran alternative exemption; includes Operation Graphic Hand.
Title
Relates to including certain reserve veterans for purposes of the veteran alternative exemption; includes Operation Graphic Hand.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.476 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.390 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6140a |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1613 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-04-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4842A |
2016-04-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A06140 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s4842a