NY A06140 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s4842a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s4842a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including certain reserve veterans for purposes of the veteran alternative exemption; includes Operation Graphic Hand.
Title
Relates to including certain reserve veterans for purposes of the veteran alternative exemption; includes Operation Graphic Hand.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s4842a |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.390 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | print number 6140a |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04842 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.476