NY S05003 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reports of unclaimed amounts of money or other property.
Title
Relates to reports of unclaimed amounts of money or other property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5003A |
2015-05-26 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06080 (Same As) 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE