NY S05056 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.137
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.137
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the superintendent of financial services to create a private education debt registry which shall contain information and documentation relating to loans issued by creditors including interest rates and copies of the notes and instruments used by such creditors for education loans.
Title
Directs the superintendent of financial services to create a private education debt registry which shall contain information and documentation relating to loans issued by creditors including interest rates and copies of the notes and instruments used by such creditors for education loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.137 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.867 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a5286a |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5056A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-05 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2023-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1098 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A05286 (Same As) 2023-06-21 - substituted by s5056a