NY S05170 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of transportation to establish a maximum speed limit of 35 miles per hour on state route 908H, better known as "Ocean parkway", in the county of Kings.
Title
Directs the department of transportation to establish a maximum speed limit of 35 miles per hour on state route 908H, better known as "Ocean parkway", in the county of Kings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5170A |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.847 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06724 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation