NY S05171 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5171A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5171A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York city department of corrections and the New York city health and hospitals corporation to adopt safety policies to protect health care workers who treat incarcerated individuals.
Title
Requires the New York city department of corrections and the New York city health and hospitals corporation to adopt safety policies to protect health care workers who treat incarcerated individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5171A |
2024-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A08083 (Same As) 2024-02-02 - print number 8083a