NY S05189 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment made to any such organization.
Title
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment made to any such organization.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.235 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.462 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7471 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.657 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07471 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - substituted by s5189