NY S05191 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5191A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5191A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides limitations on use of evidence obtained in connection with a person seeking or receiving health care for a drug overdose.
Title
Provides limitations on use of evidence obtained in connection with a person seeking or receiving health care for a drug overdose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | PRINT NUMBER 5191A | |
2010-06-24 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A8147 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES