NY S05196 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a residential redevelopment inhibited property exemption in certain cities.
Title
Authorizes a residential redevelopment inhibited property exemption in certain cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.2 |
2015-10-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.406 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.674 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7570a |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1827 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 5196A |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5196B |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5196A |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07570 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5196a