NY S05229 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the permitted use of proceeds from the lease of lands located at the state university of New York at Purchase to support current full-time faculty positions.
Title
Expands the permitted use of proceeds from the lease of lands located at the state university of New York at Purchase to support current full-time faculty positions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5806 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.682 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05806 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - signed chap.562