NY S05246 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6247A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6247A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the assessment of the record of performance of mortgage bankers in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.
Title
Relates to the assessment of the record of performance of mortgage bankers in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6247A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1691 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5246A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2021-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A06247 (Same As) 2021-11-01 - signed chap.549