NY S05262 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.638
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.638
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the purpose and duties of the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of North Tarrytown, New York and the usage of moneys received from foreign fire insurance companies by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of North Tarrytown, New York.
Title
Relates to the purpose and duties of the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of North Tarrytown, New York and the usage of moneys received from foreign fire insurance companies by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of North Tarrytown, New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.638 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.385 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7069a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1218 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5262A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07069 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.638