NY S05269 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes expedited settlement conference processes for establishing child support orders where both parties voluntarily agree on the process.
Title
Authorizes expedited settlement conference processes for establishing child support orders where both parties voluntarily agree on the process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.779 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.646 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05735 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary