NY S05281 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.639
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.639
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Alienates certain parklands in the town of Stony Point, county of Rockland, conveyed to said town pursuant to Chapter 851 of the Laws of 1973.
Title
Alienates certain parklands in the town of Stony Point, county of Rockland, conveyed to said town pursuant to Chapter 851 of the Laws of 1973.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.639 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.690 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7610a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5281B |
2019-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.578 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5281A |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07610 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.639