NY S05294 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting funding of terrorist activities through donations to not-for-profit organizations and requires not-for-profit corporations to file reports when conducting business with certain countries.
Title
Relates to prohibiting funding of terrorist activities through donations to not-for-profit organizations and requires not-for-profit corporations to file reports when conducting business with certain countries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2011-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |